Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bélanger, Hon. Mauril | Liberal | Ottawa—Vanier | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bennett, Hon. Carolyn | Liberal | St. Paul's | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Brison, Hon. Scott | Liberal | Kings—Hants | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Byrne, Hon. Gerry | Liberal | Humber—St. Barbe—Baie Verte | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.