Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saganash, Romeo | NDP | Abitibi—Baie-James—Nunavik—Eeyou | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sandhu, Jasbir | NDP | Surrey North | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Savoie, Denise | NDP | Victoria | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Friday, August 31, 2012 |
Scott, Craig | NDP | Toronto—Danforth | Ontario | Monday, March 19, 2012 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sellah, Djaouida | NDP | Saint-Bruno—Saint-Hubert | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sims, Jinny Jogindera | NDP | Newton—North Delta | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sitsabaiesan, Rathika | NDP | Scarborough—Rouge River | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Stewart, Kennedy | NDP | Burnaby—Douglas | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Stoffer, Peter | NDP | Sackville—Eastern Shore | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sullivan, Mike | NDP | York South—Weston | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.