Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 12 of 12
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mai, Hoang | NDP | Brossard—La Prairie | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Marston, Wayne | NDP | Hamilton East—Stoney Creek | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Martin, Pat | NDP | Winnipeg Centre | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Masse, Brian | NDP | Windsor West | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Mathyssen, Irene | NDP | London—Fanshawe | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Michaud, Élaine | NDP | Portneuf—Jacques-Cartier | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Moore, Christine | NDP | Abitibi—Témiscamingue | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Morin, Dany | NDP | Chicoutimi—Le Fjord | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Morin, Isabelle | NDP | Notre-Dame-de-Grâce—Lachine | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Morin, Marc-André | NDP | Laurentides—Labelle | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Morin, Marie-Claude | NDP | Saint-Hyacinthe—Bagot | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Mulcair, Hon. Thomas J. | NDP | Outremont | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.