Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lapointe, François | NDP | Montmagny—L'Islet—Kamouraska—Rivière-du-Loup | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Latendresse, Alexandrine | NDP | Louis-Saint-Laurent | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Laverdière, Hélène | NDP | Laurier—Sainte-Marie | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Layton, Hon. Jack | NDP | Toronto—Danforth | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Monday, August 22, 2011 |
LeBlanc, Hélène | NDP | LaSalle—Émard | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Leslie, Megan Anissa | NDP | Halifax | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Liu, Laurin | NDP | Rivière-des-Mille-Îles | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.