Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harris, Dan | NDP | Scarborough Southwest | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Harris, Jack | NDP | St. John's East | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Hughes, Carol | NDP | Algoma—Manitoulin—Kapuskasing | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.