Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allen, Malcolm | NDP | Welland | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Angus, Charlie | NDP | Timmins—James Bay | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Ashton, Niki | NDP | Churchill | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Atamanenko, Alex | NDP | British Columbia Southern Interior | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Aubin, Robert | NDP | Trois-Rivières | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Ayala, Paulina | NDP | Honoré-Mercier | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.