Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malo, Luc | Bloc Québécois | Verchères—Les Patriotes | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Ménard, Réal | Bloc Québécois | Hochelaga | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Wednesday, September 16, 2009 |
Ménard, Serge | Bloc Québécois | Marc-Aurèle-Fortin | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Mendès, Alexandra | Liberal | Brossard—La Prairie | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Mourani, Maria | Bloc Québécois | Ahuntsic | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Mulcair, Hon. Thomas J. | NDP | Outremont | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.