Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laforest, Jean-Yves | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Maurice—Champlain | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Laframboise, Mario | Bloc Québécois | Argenteuil—Papineau—Mirabel | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lalonde, Francine | Bloc Québécois | La Pointe-de-l'Île | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lavallée, Carole | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Bruno—Saint-Hubert | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lebel, Hon. Denis | Conservative | Roberval—Lac-Saint-Jean | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lemay, Marc | Bloc Québécois | Abitibi—Témiscamingue | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lessard, Yves | Bloc Québécois | Chambly—Borduas | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lévesque, Yvon | Bloc Québécois | Abitibi—Baie-James—Nunavik—Eeyou | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.