Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
André, Guy | Bloc Québécois | Berthier—Maskinongé | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Arthur, André | Independent | Portneuf—Jacques-Cartier | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Asselin, Gérard | Bloc Québécois | Manicouagan | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.