Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Schellenberger, Gary Ralph | Conservative | Perth—Wellington | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Sgro, Hon. Judy A. | Liberal | York West | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Shipley, Bev | Conservative | Lambton—Kent—Middlesex | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Silva, Mario | Liberal | Davenport | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Simson, Michelle | Liberal | Scarborough Southwest | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Stanton, Bruce | Conservative | Simcoe North | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Sweet, David | Conservative | Ancaster—Dundas—Flamborough—Westdale | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Szabo, Paul | Liberal | Mississauga South | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.