Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lauzon, Guy | Conservative | Stormont—Dundas—South Glengarry | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Layton, Hon. Jack | NDP | Toronto—Danforth | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lee, Derek | Liberal | Scarborough—Rouge River | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lemieux, Pierre | Conservative | Glengarry—Prescott—Russell | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lobb, Ben | Conservative | Huron—Bruce | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.