Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hall Findlay, Martha | Liberal | Willowdale | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Holder, Ed | Conservative | London West | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Holland, Mark | Liberal | Ajax—Pickering | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Hughes, Carol | NDP | Algoma—Manitoulin—Kapuskasing | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Hyer, Bruce | NDP | Thunder Bay—Superior North | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.