Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
O'Connor, Hon. Gordon | Conservative | Carleton—Mississippi Mills | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Oda, Hon. Bev | Conservative | Durham | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.