Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Galipeau, Royal | Conservative | Ottawa—Orléans | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Gallant, Cheryl | Conservative | Renfrew—Nipissing—Pembroke | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Généreux, Bernard | Conservative | Montmagny—L'Islet—Kamouraska—Rivière-du-Loup | Quebec | Monday, November 9, 2009 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Glover, Shelly | Conservative | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Goldring, Peter | Conservative | Edmonton East | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Goodyear, Hon. Gary | Conservative | Cambridge | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Gourde, Jacques | Conservative | Lotbinière—Chutes-de-la-Chaudière | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Grewal, Nina | Conservative | Fleetwood—Port Kells | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.