Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fantino, Hon. Julian | Conservative | Vaughan | Ontario | Monday, November 29, 2010 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Fast, Hon. Ed | Conservative | Abbotsford | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Finley, Hon. Diane | Conservative | Haldimand—Norfolk | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Flaherty, Hon. Jim | Conservative | Whitby—Oshawa | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Fletcher, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Charleswood—St. James—Assiniboia | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.