Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Day, Hon. Stockwell | Conservative | Okanagan—Coquihalla | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Dechert, Bob | Conservative | Mississauga—Erindale | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Del Mastro, Dean | Conservative | Peterborough | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Devolin, Barry | Conservative | Haliburton—Kawartha Lakes—Brock | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Dreeshen, Earl | Conservative | Red Deer | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Duncan, Hon. John | Conservative | Vancouver Island North | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Dykstra, Rick | Conservative | St. Catharines | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.