Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gallant, Cheryl | Conservative | Renfrew—Nipissing—Pembroke | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Glover, Shelly | Conservative | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Grewal, Nina | Conservative | Fleetwood—Port Kells | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.