Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 9 of 9
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bachand, Claude | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Jean | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Beaudin, Josée | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Lambert | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bellavance, André | Bloc Québécois | Richmond—Arthabaska | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bigras, Bernard | Bloc Québécois | Rosemont—La Petite-Patrie | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Blais, Raynald | Bloc Québécois | Gaspésie—Îles-de-la-Madeleine | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bonsant, France | Bloc Québécois | Compton—Stanstead | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bouchard, Robert | Bloc Québécois | Chicoutimi—Le Fjord | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bourgeois, Diane | Bloc Québécois | Terrebonne—Blainville | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Brunelle, Paule | Bloc Québécois | Trois-Rivières | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.