Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pacetti, Massimo | Liberal | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Patry, Bernard | Liberal | Pierrefonds—Dollard | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Pearson, Glen Douglas | Liberal | London North Centre | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Proulx, Marcel | Liberal | Hull—Aylmer | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.