Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cannis, John | Liberal | Scarborough Centre | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Coady, Siobhan | Liberal | St. John's South—Mount Pearl | Newfoundland and Labrador | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Crombie, Bonnie | Liberal | Mississauga—Streetsville | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Cuzner, Rodger | Liberal | Cape Breton—Canso | Nova Scotia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.