Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ratansi, Yasmin | Liberal | Don Valley East | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Redman, Hon. Karen | Liberal | Kitchener Centre | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Robillard, Hon. Lucienne | Liberal | Westmount—Ville-Marie | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Friday, January 25, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.