Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faille, Meili | Bloc Québécois | Vaudreuil-Soulanges | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Finley, Hon. Diane | Conservative | Haldimand—Norfolk | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Folco, Raymonde | Liberal | Laval—Les Îles | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Freeman, Carole | Bloc Québécois | Châteauguay—Saint-Constant | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Fry, Hon. Hedy | Liberal | Vancouver Centre | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.