Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chamberlain, Hon. Brenda | Liberal | Guelph | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, April 7, 2008 |
Charlton, Chris | NDP | Hamilton Mountain | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Chow, Olivia | NDP | Trinity—Spadina | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Crowder, Jean | NDP | Nanaimo—Cowichan | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.