Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 11 of 11
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbot, Vivian | Bloc Québécois | Papineau | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Barnes, Hon. Sue | Liberal | London West | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Beaumier, Colleen | Liberal | Brampton West | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bell, Catherine | NDP | Vancouver Island North | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bennett, Hon. Carolyn | Liberal | St. Paul's | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Black, Dawn | NDP | New Westminster—Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bonsant, France | Bloc Québécois | Compton—Stanstead | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Boucher, Sylvie | Conservative | Beauport—Limoilou | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bourgeois, Diane | Bloc Québécois | Terrebonne—Blainville | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Brown, Bonnie | Liberal | Oakville | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Brunelle, Paule | Bloc Québécois | Trois-Rivières | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.