Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pallister, Brian | Conservative | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Paradis, Hon. Christian | Conservative | Mégantic—L'Érable | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Petit, Daniel | Conservative | Charlesbourg—Haute-Saint-Charles | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Poilievre, Pierre | Conservative | Nepean—Carleton | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Prentice, Hon. Jim | Conservative | Calgary Centre-North | Alberta | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Preston, Joe | Conservative | Elgin—Middlesex—London | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.