Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 11 of 11
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
MacKay, Hon. Peter Gordon | Conservative | Central Nova | Nova Scotia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
MacKenzie, Dave | Conservative | Oxford | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Manning, Hon. Fabian | Conservative | Avalon | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Mark, Inky | Conservative | Dauphin—Swan River—Marquette | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Mayes, Colin | Conservative | Okanagan—Shuswap | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Menzies, Hon. Ted | Conservative | Macleod | Alberta | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Merrifield, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Yellowhead | Alberta | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Miller, Larry | Conservative | Bruce—Grey—Owen Sound | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Mills, Bob | Conservative | Red Deer | Alberta | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Moore, Hon. James | Conservative | Port Moody—Westwood—Port Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Moore, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Fundy Royal | New Brunswick | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.