Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Day, Hon. Stockwell | Conservative | Okanagan—Coquihalla | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Del Mastro, Dean | Conservative | Peterborough | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Devolin, Barry | Conservative | Haliburton—Kawartha Lakes—Brock | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Doyle, Hon. Norman E. | Conservative | St. John's East | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Dykstra, Rick | Conservative | St. Catharines | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.