Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marceau, Richard | Bloc Québécois | Charlesbourg—Haute-Saint-Charles | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Martin, Right Hon. Paul | Liberal | LaSalle—Émard | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Ménard, Réal | Bloc Québécois | Hochelaga | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Ménard, Serge | Bloc Québécois | Marc-Aurèle-Fortin | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.