Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 9 of 9
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laframboise, Mario | Bloc Québécois | Argenteuil—Papineau—Mirabel | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lalonde, Francine | Bloc Québécois | La Pointe-de-l'Île | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lapierre, Hon. Jean C. | Liberal | Outremont | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lapierre, Réal | Bloc Québécois | Lévis—Bellechasse | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lavallée, Carole | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Bruno—Saint-Hubert | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lemay, Marc | Bloc Québécois | Abitibi—Témiscamingue | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lessard, Yves | Bloc Québécois | Chambly—Borduas | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lévesque, Yvon | Bloc Québécois | Abitibi—Baie-James—Nunavik—Eeyou | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Loubier, Yvan | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Hyacinthe—Bagot | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.