Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faille, Meili | Bloc Québécois | Vaudreuil-Soulanges | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Folco, Raymonde | Liberal | Laval—Les Îles | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Frulla, Hon. Liza | Liberal | Jeanne-Le Ber | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.