Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cardin, Serge | Bloc Québécois | Sherbrooke | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Carrier, Robert | Bloc Québécois | Alfred-Pellan | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Clavet, Roger | Bloc Québécois | Louis-Hébert | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Cleary, Bernard | Bloc Québécois | Louis-Saint-Laurent | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Côté, Guy | Bloc Québécois | Portneuf—Jacques-Cartier | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Crête, Paul | Bloc Québécois | Montmagny—L'Islet—Kamouraska—Rivière-du-Loup | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.