Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 13 of 13
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bachand, Claude | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Jean | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bakopanos, Hon. Eleni | Liberal | Ahuntsic | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bellavance, André | Bloc Québécois | Richmond—Arthabaska | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bergeron, Stéphane | Bloc Québécois | Verchères—Les Patriotes | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Wednesday, November 9, 2005 |
Bigras, Bernard | Bloc Québécois | Rosemont—La Petite-Patrie | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Blais, Raynald | Bloc Québécois | Gaspésie—Îles-de-la-Madeleine | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Boire, Alain | Bloc Québécois | Beauharnois—Salaberry | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Boivin, Françoise | Liberal | Gatineau | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bonsant, France | Bloc Québécois | Compton—Stanstead | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bouchard, Robert | Bloc Québécois | Chicoutimi—Le Fjord | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Boulianne, Marc | Bloc Québécois | Mégantic—L'Érable | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bourgeois, Diane | Bloc Québécois | Terrebonne—Blainville | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Brunelle, Paule | Bloc Québécois | Trois-Rivières | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.