Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wappel, Tom | Liberal | Scarborough Southwest | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Watson, Jeff | Conservative | Essex | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Wilfert, Hon. Bryon | Liberal | Richmond Hill | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Wrzesnewskyj, Borys | Liberal | Etobicoke Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.