Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 17 of 17
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
D'Amours, Jean-Claude | Liberal | Madawaska—Restigouche | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Davies, Libby | NDP | Vancouver East | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Day, Hon. Stockwell | Conservative | Okanagan—Coquihalla | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Demers, Nicole | Bloc Québécois | Laval | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Deschamps, Johanne | Bloc Québécois | Laurentides—Labelle | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Desjarlais, Bev | Independent | Churchill | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Desrochers, Odina | Bloc Québécois | Lotbinière—Chutes-de-la-Chaudière | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
DeVillers, Hon. Paul | Liberal | Simcoe North | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Devolin, Barry | Conservative | Haliburton—Kawartha Lakes—Brock | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Dhalla, Ruby | Liberal | Brampton—Springdale | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Dion, Hon. Stéphane | Liberal | Saint-Laurent—Cartierville | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Dosanjh, Hon. Ujjal | Liberal | Vancouver South | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Doyle, Hon. Norman E. | Conservative | St. John's East | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Drouin, Hon. Claude | Liberal | Beauce | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Dryden, Hon. Ken | Liberal | York Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Duceppe, Gilles | Bloc Québécois | Laurier—Sainte-Marie | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Duncan, Hon. John | Conservative | Vancouver Island North | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.