Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gagnon, Marcel | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Maurice—Champlain | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Gagnon, Sébastien | Bloc Québécois | Jonquière—Alma | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Gaudet, Roger | Bloc Québécois | Montcalm | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Gauthier, Michel | Bloc Québécois | Roberval—Lac-Saint-Jean | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Guimond, Michel | Bloc Québécois | Montmorency—Charlevoix—Haute-Côte-Nord | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.