Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abbott, Hon. Jim | Conservative | Kootenay—Columbia | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Adams, Hon. Peter | Liberal | Peterborough | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Alcock, Hon. Reg | Liberal | Winnipeg South | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Allison, Dean | Conservative | Niagara West—Glanbrook | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Anders, Rob | Conservative | Calgary West | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Anderson, David | Conservative | Cypress Hills—Grasslands | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Anderson, Hon. David A. | Liberal | Victoria | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
André, Guy | Bloc Québécois | Berthier—Maskinongé | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Angus, Charlie | NDP | Timmins—James Bay | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Asselin, Gérard | Bloc Québécois | Manicouagan | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.