Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Parrish, Carolyn | Independent | Mississauga—Erindale | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Phinney, Beth | Liberal | Hamilton Mountain | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Picard, Pauline | Bloc Québécois | Drummond | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Poirier-Rivard, Denise | Bloc Québécois | Châteauguay—Saint-Constant | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.