Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gagnon, Christiane | Bloc Québécois | Québec | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Gallant, Cheryl | Conservative | Renfrew—Nipissing—Pembroke | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Grewal, Nina | Conservative | Fleetwood—Port Kells | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Guarnieri, Hon. Albina | Liberal | Mississauga East—Cooksville | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Guay, Monique | Bloc Québécois | Rivière-du-Nord | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Guergis, Hon. Helena | Conservative | Simcoe—Grey | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.