Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
O'Connor, Hon. Gordon | Conservative | Carleton—Mississippi Mills | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Obhrai, Deepak | Conservative | Calgary East | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Oda, Hon. Bev | Conservative | Durham | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.