Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paquette, Pierre A. | Bloc Québécois | Joliette | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Perron, Gilles-A. | Bloc Québécois | Rivière-des-Mille-Îles | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Picard, Pauline | Bloc Québécois | Drummond | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Plamondon, Louis | Bloc Québécois | Bas-Richelieu—Nicolet—Bécancour | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Poirier-Rivard, Denise | Bloc Québécois | Châteauguay—Saint-Constant | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.