Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Demers, Nicole | Bloc Québécois | Laval | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Deschamps, Johanne | Bloc Québécois | Laurentides—Labelle | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Desrochers, Odina | Bloc Québécois | Lotbinière—Chutes-de-la-Chaudière | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Duceppe, Gilles | Bloc Québécois | Laurier—Sainte-Marie | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.