Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lapierre, Hon. Jean C. | Liberal | Outremont | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lastewka, Hon. Walt | Liberal | St. Catharines | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
LeBlanc, Hon. Dominic | Liberal | Beauséjour | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lee, Derek | Liberal | Scarborough—Rouge River | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Longfield, Hon. Judi | Liberal | Whitby—Oshawa | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.