Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopherson, David | NDP | Hamilton Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Comartin, Joe | NDP | Windsor—Tecumseh | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Crowder, Jean | NDP | Nanaimo—Cowichan | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Cullen, Nathan | NDP | Skeena—Bulkley Valley | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.