Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marceau, Richard | Bloc Québécois | Charlesbourg—Jacques-Cartier | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Marcil, Hon. Serge | Liberal | Beauharnois—Salaberry | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Martin, Right Hon. Paul | Liberal | LaSalle—Émard | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Ménard, Réal | Bloc Québécois | Hochelaga—Maisonneuve | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.