Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tobin, Hon. Brian | Liberal | Bonavista—Trinity—Conception | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Friday, January 25, 2002 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.