Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harvard, Hon. John | Liberal | Charleswood St. James—Assiniboia | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Thursday, May 6, 2004 |
Hilstrom, Howard | Conservative | Selkirk—Interlake | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.