Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Manning, Preston | Canadian Alliance | Calgary Southwest | Alberta | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Thursday, January 31, 2002 |
McLellan, Hon. Anne | Liberal | Edmonton West | Alberta | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Merrifield, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Yellowhead | Alberta | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Mills, Bob | Conservative | Red Deer | Alberta | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.