Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gagliano, Hon. Alfonso L. | Liberal | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gagnon, Christiane | Bloc Québécois | Québec | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gauthier, Michel | Bloc Québécois | Roberval | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Girard-Bujold, Jocelyne | Bloc Québécois | Jonquière | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Godin, Maurice | Bloc Québécois | Châteauguay | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Guay, Monique | Bloc Québécois | Laurentides | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Guimond, Michel | Bloc Québécois | Beauport—Montmorency—Côte-de-Beaupré—Île-d'Orléans | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.