Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 9 of 9
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Serré, Benoît | Liberal | Timiskaming—Cochrane | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Sgro, Hon. Judy A. | Liberal | York West | Ontario | Monday, November 15, 1999 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Shepherd, Alex | Liberal | Durham | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Speller, Hon. Bob | Liberal | Haldimand—Norfolk—Brant | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
St. Denis, Brent | Liberal | Algoma—Manitoulin | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Steckle, Paul | Liberal | Huron—Bruce | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Stewart, Hon. Christine | Liberal | Northumberland | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Stewart, Hon. Jane | Liberal | Brant | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Szabo, Paul | Liberal | Mississauga South | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.