Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 3 of 3
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harvard, Hon. John | Liberal | Charleswood St. James—Assiniboia | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Hilstrom, Howard | Canadian Alliance | Selkirk—Interlake | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Hoeppner, Jake | Independent | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.